Global patent index - EP 0689222 B1

EP 0689222 B1 2000-01-19 - Method of manufacturing micropoint electron source

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing micropoint electron source

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren einer Mikrospitzelektronenquelle

Title (fr)

Procédé de réalisation de sources d'électrons à micropointes

Publication

EP 0689222 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95400910 A

Priority

  • FR 9404948 A
  • FR 9413972 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2719156A1] A micro-tip electron source has micro-tips, each of which consists of a first frusto-conical portion (20) of a first conductive material and a second conical tip portion deposited on the first portion and made of a second conductive material which can be thinned by selective etching w.r.t. the first material. Pref. the first material is Nb and the second material is Mo, Si, Cr, Fe or Ni. Also claimed is a cathodoluminescent display device including the above micro-tip electron source. Pref. the height of the first portion (20) is such that its top is at the same level as the lower plane (I) of the grids (10a) of the source. The micro-tips are pref. subjected to cleaning and the second tip portion is subjected to thinning by surface etching.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 9/02; H01J 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/304 (2006.01); H01J 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/025 (2013.01); H01J 1/3042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2719156 A1 19951027; FR 2719156 B1 19960524; CA 2146528 A1 19951026; DE 69514576 D1 20000224; DE 69514576 T2 20000810; DE 69531220 D1 20030807; DE 69531220 T2 20040527; EP 0689222 A2 19951227; EP 0689222 A3 19960207; EP 0689222 B1 20000119; EP 0856868 A2 19980805; EP 0856868 A3 19980930; EP 0856868 B1 20030702; US 5635790 A 19970603

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150423

2015-05-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150423

2015-04-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69514576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-02-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69514576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971120

1996-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960712

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1995-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT