Global Patent Index - EP 0690206 B1

EP 0690206 B1 2000-03-01 - Diffusor for a turbomachine

Title (en)

Diffusor for a turbomachine

Title (de)

Diffusor für Turbomaschine

Title (fr)

Diffuseur pour une turbomachine

Publication

EP 0690206 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810378 A

Priority

DE 4422700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0690206A2] The deflection angles (aN,aZ) at the diffuser inlet, both at the hub and at the cylinder of the turbine, are set solely so as to give an even pressure gradient over the passage height at the outlet from the last row of blades (7A). Flow-guiding ribs are provided inside the retardation zone of the diffuser, so as to suppress turbulence, and the diffuser is divided by a guide plate. The diffuser has an axial inlet and a radial outlet, and is divided between them by the plate (60), which curves radially in the outwards direction, into inner and outer passages (50,51). In the outer passage, flow through the ribs takes place in the radial direction, and in the inner one in the diagonal direction. To avoid interference with the last row of blades, in the inner passage the ratio of the distance of the ribs (a) from the blade outlet to the rib pitch can be 0.5:1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/30 (2013.01); F05D 2250/71 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0690206 A2 19960103; EP 0690206 A3 19970813; EP 0690206 B1 20000301; CN 1116271 A 19960207; DE 4422700 A1 19960104; JP H0842306 A 19960213; US 5588799 A 19961231; US 5707208 A 19980113

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040608

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040608

2003-12-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-12-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030603

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-06-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-05-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507868 20000406

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980204

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG

1996-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT