Global Patent Index - EP 0690224 B1

EP 0690224 B1 2000-08-02 - Internal combustion engine with injection device

Title (en)

Internal combustion engine with injection device

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine mit Einspritzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne avec dispositif d'injection

Publication

EP 0690224 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94115021 A

Priority

US 26800494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5419297A] The fuel injector nozzle injects fuel into the runner in a direction that may be either parallel or non-parallel to the co-axis of the fuel injector and its mounting socket, and the nozzle orifice from which the fuel is injected is disposed beyond an antechamber of the mounting socket so as to lie within the runner, hence injecting the fuel from the orifice at a location that does not lie within the antechamber of the mounting socket.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 69/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 69/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 69/044 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5419297 A 19950530; CN 1118412 A 19960313; DE 59409470 D1 20000907; EP 0690224 A1 19960103; EP 0690224 B1 20000802; JP H08177686 A 19960712; KR 100374891 B1 20030509

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140924

2014-09-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409470

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-09-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050923

2004-09-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030923

2003-09-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030923

2002-09-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020910

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409470 20000907

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970724

1996-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960626

1996-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT