Global Patent Index - EP 0690346 B1

EP 0690346 B1 2000-10-11 - Laser-print system for motion picture films

Title (en)

Laser-print system for motion picture films

Title (de)

Laserdruckvorrichtung für Kinofilme

Title (fr)

Dispositif de gravure d'un film cinématographique par faisceau laser

Publication

EP 0690346 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401497 A

Priority

FR 9407876 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0690346A1] The device drives and controls the position of a film (7), with a device for printing on the film using a laser beam (F). The displacements of the laser beam are controlled by an optical x-y deflection system (S) under the control of a computer. The system includes a motor (M) controlled by the computer and making the film run continuously, but with interruptions for printing the film. A toothed device is coupled to the motor, and faults in the centricity of the drive are detected, with appropriate compensation being applied to the laser beam. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 11/02; G03B 17/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 17/24 (2006.01); B23K 26/02 (2006.01); B23K 26/08 (2006.01); G03C 11/02 (2006.01); H01S 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 11/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0690346 A1 19960103; EP 0690346 B1 20001011; AT 196952 T 20001015; CN 1053971 C 20000628; CN 1115869 A 19960131; DE 69519059 D1 20001116; DE 69519059 T2 20010510; DK 0690346 T3 20010102; ES 2151586 T3 20010101; FR 2721723 A1 19951229; FR 2721723 B1 19960920; JP H08150489 A 19960611; PT 690346 E 20010330; US 5835385 A 19981110

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CINEMA MAGNETIQUE COMMUNICATION *CMC

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050624

2006-03-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050623

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-12-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050624

2005-06-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050624

2005-06-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-06-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-06-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-06-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050623

2004-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-06 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040706

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-25 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-11 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040611

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001212

2001-01-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151586 T3

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-11-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519059 20001116

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196952 T 20001015

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990729

2000-03-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LASER-PRINT SYSTEM FOR MOTION PICTURE FILMS

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990729

1996-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960119

1996-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IT LI LU NL PT SE