Global Patent Index - EP 0690754 B1

EP 0690754 B1 2000-07-19 - HAND-TOOL FOR WIDENING A PIPE END

Title (en)

HAND-TOOL FOR WIDENING A PIPE END

Title (de)

HANDGERÄT ZUM AUSWEITEN EINES ROHRENDES

Title (fr)

OUTIL A MAIN SERVANT A ELARGIR UNE EXTREMITE DE TUYAU

Publication

EP 0690754 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92924712 A

Priority

  • EP 9202863 W
  • NL 9102050 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9311889A1] The present invention provides a tool for arranging on a pipe an approximately truncated cone-shaped pipe end, comprising: a mandrel (30) provided with a tapering end (31); holding means (3, 4) for fixedly holding the pipe end; and an operating arm (11) which causes the mandrel (30) to move relative to the holding means (3, 4). The above stated tool can be embodied with dimensions which are hardly larger than a so-called pipe wrench, which is suited as hand-tool and which considerably facilitate installation operations, particularly in places which are difficult of access, such as under and/or behind a bar table in a catering establishment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 41/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9311889 A1 19930624; AU 3086692 A 19930719; DE 69231283 D1 20000824; DE 69231283 T2 20010222; EP 0690754 A1 19960110; EP 0690754 B1 20000719; JP H07506766 A 19950727; NL 9102050 A 19930701

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TAPKOEL B.V.

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-01-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030106

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021231

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-07-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011208

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011208

2001-10-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-09-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: TAPKOEL B.V.

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69231283 20000824

2000-08-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TAPKOEL B.V.

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1999-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HAND-TOOL FOR WIDENING A PIPE END

1996-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960410

1996-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940510

1996-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL