Global Patent Index - EP 0691101 B1

EP 0691101 B1 2000-03-22 - Powdered and liquid detergent and additive detergent integrated dispenser for wasching machines, in particular household dish-washing machines

Title (en)

Powdered and liquid detergent and additive detergent integrated dispenser for wasching machines, in particular household dish-washing machines

Title (de)

Integrierte Dosiervorrichtung für Pulver- und Flüssigwaschmittel und additive für Waschmaschinen, Speziell für Geschirrspüler

Title (fr)

Distributeur de détergents poudreux et liquides ou d'additifs intégrés pour des machines à laver, en particulier pour des machines à laver la vaisselle

Publication

EP 0691101 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95110111 A

Priority

IT BL940006 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0691101A1] Powdered and liquid detergent and additive detergent integrated dispenser for household dish-washing machines, comprising a box-like envelope (13) made of molded plastic material, in which there are embodied a first container (15) having long duration storage capacity with powdered detergent at such amounts as to perform different washing cycles, a second container (17) for liquid additive detergents like the brightness conditioner, and a third container (18) for powdered or liquid detergent, with a dose for a single washing cycle. The dispenser is arranged for being filled with detergents and additive detergents and for distributing them automatically during each selected washing cycle. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/44; A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); A47L 15/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4409 (2013.01); A47L 15/4257 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0691101 A1 19960110; EP 0691101 B1 20000322; DE 69515744 D1 20000427; IT 230721 Y1 19990609; IT BL940006 U1 19960105; IT BL940006 V0 19940705

INPADOC legal status


2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-06-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000624

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515744 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

1997-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970908

1996-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960703

1996-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL SE