Global Patent Index - EP 0691160 B1

EP 0691160 B1 2001-02-28 - Method for recovering valuable materials from refuse incineration slag

Title (en)

Method for recovering valuable materials from refuse incineration slag

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Rückgewinnen von Wertstoffen aus Müllverbrennungsschlacke

Title (fr)

Procédé pour récuperer des matériaux de valeur à partir de scories d'incinération de déchets

Publication

EP 0691160 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810425 A

Priority

DE 4423927 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0691160A1] In the recovery of materials from refuse burning furnaces, the slag is drawn from the furnace without subsequent water quenching. The components are sepd. through screens. In the first screen particles smaller than 2 mm are discarded. The remainder is passed to a second screen in which particles smaller than 25-35 mm, are passed to a third screen, and particles above that size are passed to a fourth screen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03B 5/02 (2006.01); B03B 9/04 (2006.01); B03C 1/00 (2006.01); B07B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03B 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0691160 A1 19960110; EP 0691160 B1 20010228; AT 199326 T 20010315; DE 4423927 A1 19960111; JP 3701347 B2 20050928; JP H08168694 A 19960702

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 199326 T

- Effective date: 20150623

2015-08-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150622

2015-07-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150622

2015-07-01 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150623

2015-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-06-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59509047

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK

- Free text: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK#LEOPOLDSTRASSE 248#80807 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK#LEOPOLDSTRASSE 248#80807 MUENCHEN (DE)

2004-03-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2003-10-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK

- Free text: ALSTOM#25, AVENUE KLEBER#75116 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK#LEOPOLDSTRASSE 248#80807 MUENCHEN (DE)

2003-10-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-05-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-04-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GIACOMO BOLIS C/O ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ABB RESEARCH LTD. TRANSFER- ALSTOM

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509047 20010405

2001-03-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABB RESEARCH LIMITED

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199326 T 20010315

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000131

1996-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960603

1996-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE