Global patent index - EP 0691190 B1

EP 0691190 B1 2000-09-27 - Apparatus for manufacturing photographic filmstrips

Title (en)

Apparatus for manufacturing photographic filmstrips

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von fotografischen Filmen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la production de pellicules photographiques

Publication

EP 0691190 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95109838 A

Priority

JP 14332094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0691190A2] In an apparatus for manufacturing filmstrips having a variable length and a variable number of perforations from a long strip of continuous film, a die set device (45) is provided with a plurality of punch holders (46a,47a,48a) aligned adjacent to one another in a film transporting direction. At least one of the punch holders are selectively actuated to make a designated number of equally spaced perforations at a time. A film length adjusting device (58) is provided for adjusting the length of the continuous film extending between the die set device (45) and a cutter (28) in accordance with a unit length which is determined for each variable length of the filmstrip, such that the cutter (28) and the punch holder or punch holders are actuated in synchronism with each other while the continuous film stops after each transport by the unit length. A pair of feed rollers (64,65) are disposed between the cutter (28) and a suction drum (60) for transporting the film toward the cutter (28). The feed rollers (64,65) have diameters less than that of the suction drum (60). A side-printer (27) is arranged to record data on the film at a peripheral position of a larger one of the feed rollers (64,65). <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 9/00; B26D 7/27; B26F 1/04; B65H 23/04; G03C 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 9/00 (2006.01); B26F 1/00 (2006.01); B26F 1/04 (2006.01); B65H 20/04 (2006.01); B65H 20/12 (2006.01); B65H 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/0007 (2013.01); B26D 9/00 (2013.01); B26F 1/04 (2013.01); B26F 1/20 (2013.01); B65H 20/04 (2013.01); B65H 20/12 (2013.01); B65H 35/0006 (2013.01); B65H 35/006 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4491 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0691190 A2 19960110; EP 0691190 A3 19960605; EP 0691190 B1 20000927; DE 69518956 D1 20001102; DE 69518956 T2 20010201

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-07-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020101

2002-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020101

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518956

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-02

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990128

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990128

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960827

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

1996-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL