Global Patent Index - EP 0691317 B1

EP 0691317 B1 2000-01-12 - Non-azide gas generant formulations

Title (en)

Non-azide gas generant formulations

Title (de)

Gaserzeugendes, azidfreies Stoffgemisch

Title (fr)

Compositions génératrices de gaz exempt d'azoture

Publication

EP 0691317 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95108938 A

Priority

DE 4423088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0691317A2] A mixture of materials for generating gas especially for the protection of passengers in vehicles consists of 20-45 wt.% of an organic cpd. contg. C, H and 35% O, and having a m.pt. 170 degrees C and 55-85 wt.% of an inorganic oxidising agent from the group perchlorate, especially Potassium perchlorate, chlorate, peroxide or mixtures of them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/26 (2006.01); C06B 29/00 (2006.01); C06B 43/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4423088 A1 19960104; EP 0691317 A2 19960110; EP 0691317 A3 19970305; EP 0691317 B1 20000112; JP 3693067 B2 20050907; JP H0840793 A 19960213; KR 100229367 B1 19991101; US 5525170 A 19960611

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59507593

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070610

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-06-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060605

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060602

- Year of fee payment: 12

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2000-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507593 20000217

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981202

1998-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRW AIRBAG SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970205

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1996-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE