Global Patent Index - EP 0691395 B1

EP 0691395 B1 2000-04-12 - Colloidal calcium hydroxide and uses thereof

Title (en)

Colloidal calcium hydroxide and uses thereof

Title (de)

Kolloidales Kalziumhydroxid und seine Verwendung

Title (fr)

Hydroxyde de calcium colloidal et ses utilisations

Publication

EP 0691395 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401592 A

Priority

FR 9408448 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0691395A1] A new colloidal prod. contg. Ca(OH)2 in the micellar core, stabilised in an organic medium by a surfactant ring, in the form of an inverse micelle, is claimed. Also claimed is the use of the prod. as a source of Ca(OH)2 in organic reactions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 159/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 13/00 (2006.01); C01F 11/02 (2006.01); C10M 159/20 (2006.01); C10M 159/22 (2006.01); C10M 159/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 159/22 (2013.01); C10M 159/20 (2013.01); C10M 159/24 (2013.01); Y10S 516/924 (2013.01); Y10S 516/927 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0691395 A1 19960110; EP 0691395 B1 20000412; CA 2153300 A1 19960107; DE 69516217 D1 20000518; DE 69516217 T2 20010104; ES 2147269 T3 20000901; FR 2722117 A1 19960112; FR 2722117 B1 19960830; JP H0848519 A 19960220; US 5756432 A 19980526

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050703

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030811

2004-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU *PETROLE

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010813

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010731

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010720

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147269 T3

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516217 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL

2000-01-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981215

1996-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960710

1996-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL