Global Patent Index - EP 0691439 B1

EP 0691439 B1 2000-04-26 - Thermal insulating panel

Title (en)

Thermal insulating panel

Title (de)

Wärmedämmplatte

Title (fr)

Panneau calorifuge

Publication

EP 0691439 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95108498 A

Priority

DE 4423747 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0691439A2] The heat damping plate of a foam plastic, such as polystyrene, has a hollow zone (2) in the plate (1) with an opening (4) at a narrow side (3), which at least partially holds the plate body (5) in the hollow zone (2). The body (5) is subjected to pressure from an adjacent heat damping plate, for partial insertion into the hollow zone (2). Also claimed is a mfg. appts. with one heated wire to cut the body (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/80 (2006.01); E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 1/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/7654 (2013.01); E04B 2001/7695 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0691439 A2 19960110; EP 0691439 A3 19960529; EP 0691439 B1 20000426; AT 192205 T 20000515; CZ 3920 U1 19951213; DE 4423747 A1 19960111; DK 0691439 T3 20000925; PL 309523 A1 19960108

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-06-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020602

2002-02-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2001-07-16 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20010716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010707

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010101

2001-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010101

2000-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ISOBOUW DAMMTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-09-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FELBER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-06-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-06-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508214 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192205 T 20000515

1997-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970107

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961129

1996-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL

1996-05-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TRAUB, EUGEN

1996-05-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PRUMPELER, JO

1996-05-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIERICKX, EMILE

1996-05-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEENBERG, JAN JANSEN

1996-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL