Global Patent Index - EP 0691571 B1

EP 0691571 B1 2000-08-30 - Developing granule or tablet for silver halide photographic light-sensitive materials and method of manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Developing granule or tablet for silver halide photographic light-sensitive materials and method of manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Entwicklungsgranulat oder -tablette für photographische lichtempfindliche Silberhalogenidmaterialien und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Granulé ou tablette de développement pour matériaux photographiques à l'halogénure d'argent sensibles à la lumière et procédé de fabrication de ceux-ci

Publication

EP 0691571 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95304013 A

Priority

JP 13213594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0691571A1] A method of manufacturing a granular or tablet developing composition for a silver halide photographic light-sensitive material is disclosed which comprises the step of: granulating a developing agent to prepare first granules comprising the developing agent, granulating an alkali agent to prepare second granules comprising the alkali agent, and mixing the first granules and the second granules, wherein the content in the first granules of granules having a particle size of 1000 mu m or more (JIS) is not more than 10 weight % based on the total weight of the first granules and the content in the second granules of granules having a particle size of 1000 mu m or more (JIS) is not more than 10 weight % based on the total weight of the second granules.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/26 (2006.01); G03C 7/413 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/265 (2013.01); G03C 7/413 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0691571 A1 19960110; EP 0691571 B1 20000830; DE 69518592 D1 20001005; DE 69518592 T2 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2005-06-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050602

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010609

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010609

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-01-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518592

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-05

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990319

1996-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960223

1996-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL