Global Patent Index - EP 0691673 B1

EP 0691673 B1 2000-03-01 - Electrical conductor in lamps

Title (en)

Electrical conductor in lamps

Title (de)

Elektrischer Leiter in Lampen

Title (fr)

Conducteur électrique dans des lampes

Publication

EP 0691673 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95201756 A

Priority

AT 132394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0691673A2] The electrical conductor comprises ribbon material based on molybdenum yttrium oxide, and is used to conduct electricity in lamps with glass/metal sealing. In addition to the molybdenum yttrium oxide, the conductor also contains between 0.03 and 1.0 percent by weight of cerium oxide, which corresponds to a cerium oxide/yttrium oxide ratio of 0.1 to 1. Alternatively, the amount of cerium oxide can be replaced by up to 40 percent in weight by one or more of the following oxides: La203, Er203, Si02, Hf02, Ze02, Ti02, AI203.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/36; C22C 27/04; H01J 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 5/46 (2006.01); H01B 1/08 (2006.01); H01J 29/28 (2006.01); H01J 61/36 (2006.01); H01K 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/36 (2013.01); H01J 29/28 (2013.01); H01J 61/368 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0691673 A2 19960110; EP 0691673 A3 19971126; EP 0691673 B1 20000301; AT 401124 B 19960625; AT A132394 A 19951015; DE 59507870 D1 20000406; JP 3459318 B2 20031020; JP H0855566 A 19960227; US 5606141 A 19970225

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150627

2015-07-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150627

2015-07-08 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150628

2015-06-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59507870

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507870 20000406

2000-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990416

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971024

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1996-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL