Global Patent Index - EP 0691801 B1

EP 0691801 B1 2000-04-05 - X-ray source

Title (en)

X-ray source

Title (de)

Röntgenstrahlenquelle

Title (fr)

Source de rayons X

Publication

EP 0691801 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95304735 A

Priority

JP 15766494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0691801A1] A micro-focused X-ray source includes an X-ray tube (10) and a target voltage generating circuit (112). The target voltage generating circuit (112) has a double invertor structure configured by a step down invertor (410) and a push-pull invertor (420) which generates little heat and thus no cooling fan needs to be provided. The circuit includes Cockcroft-Walton circuitry (20a) in which diodes and capacitors making up this circuitry are fixedly mounted on insulation boards (20b) so that the positions of the diodes and capacitors will not shift during their moulding into an insulation block. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05G 1/06; H05G 1/20; H05G 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05G 1/06 (2006.01); H05G 1/20 (2006.01); H05G 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05G 1/06 (2013.01); H05G 1/20 (2013.01); H05G 1/32 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0634885 A1 19950118 - HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0691801 A1 19960110; EP 0691801 B1 20000405; DE 69516052 D1 20000511; DE 69516052 T2 20000831; JP 2769434 B2 19980625; JP H0822896 A 19960123

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69516052

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120704

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080706

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080706

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070704

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516052 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980527

1996-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960315

1996-03-06 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19960110

1996-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB