Global Patent Index - EP 0692051 B1

EP 0692051 B1 2000-10-18 - FLOOR STRUCTURE INCLUDING PREFABRICATED FLOOR UNITS

Title (en)

FLOOR STRUCTURE INCLUDING PREFABRICATED FLOOR UNITS

Title (de)

FUSSBODENSTRUKTUR AUS VORGEFERTIGTEN FUSSBODENELEMENTEN

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE PLANCHER COMPRENANT DES ELEMENTS PREFABRIQUES

Publication

EP 0692051 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94912129 A

Priority

  • SE 9400289 W
  • SE 9301051 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9423146A1] The invention relates to a floor structure (1) with prefabricated floor units (2, 3) of reinforced concrete, and a process for manufacture of such floor units. Each floor unit (2, 3) is comprised of a base plate (4) and T-beams (6) arranged on the base plate essentially parallel to each other. The beams are securely anchored to the base plate (4) by means extending from each beam and disposed on a reinforcing ladder (14) cast in the web of the beam (6), whereby open channels (12, 13), into which electrical and telecommunication wiring and plumbing can be mounted, are formed between two adjacent beams (6). The floor structure (1), after drying out of the units (2, 3) at the factory, can be mounted in the building frame at any selected time prior to joint casting, casting together or under-casting of the walls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/04; B28B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/06 (2006.01); E04B 5/04 (2006.01); E04B 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/36 (2013.01); B28B 7/246 (2013.01); B28B 23/18 (2013.01); E04B 5/04 (2013.01); E04B 5/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9423146 A1 19941013; AT 197077 T 20001115; AU 6440494 A 19941024; DE 69426152 D1 20001123; EP 0692051 A1 19960117; EP 0692051 B1 20001018; FI 954634 A0 19950929; FI 954634 A 19950929; NO 301381 B1 19971020; NO 953849 A 19951031; NO 953849 D0 19950928; SE 502060 C2 19950731; SE 9301051 D0 19930330; SE 9301051 L 19941001

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-11-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-03-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-03-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-03-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-01-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-01-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426152 20001123

2000-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT

2000-10-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197077 T 20001115

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AB DALA CEMENT

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980121

1998-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980121

1996-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950912

1996-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT