Global Patent Index - EP 0692314 B1

EP 0692314 B1 2000-03-15 - Process and device for intensifying the contact between a rolled strip and a fluid

Title (en)

Process and device for intensifying the contact between a rolled strip and a fluid

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Intensivierung des Kontaktes zwischen einem Walzband und einer Flüssigkeit

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'intensification du contact entre une bande laminée et un fluide

Publication

EP 0692314 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95108373 A

Priority

DE 4421082 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0692314A2] Intensification of the contact between a rolled strip (1) and liquid supplied under pressure from a container (20) to a slit-shaped nozzle (24) and hence, as a high-energy stream, against the strip (1). The liquid in the form of a closed jet (10) with a narrow, high-velocity profile, extends over the width of the strip, hits the strip at the straight angle, and is then gradually deflected to become a flow (11) parallel to the strip. After covering a contact zone (26) of given width and length, the flow is directed away from the strip. The appts. includes a flow guide element (27) with a gradually curving guide surface (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02; B21B 45/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/04 (2006.01); B05B 1/28 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01); C23G 1/02 (2006.01); C23G 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 45/0218 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4421082 A1 19951221; EP 0692314 A2 19960117; EP 0692314 A3 19961211; EP 0692314 B1 20000315; ES 2144541 T3 20000616; JP H0857524 A 19960305

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040602

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG A.G. *SMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2003-06-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030616

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030612

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030604

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030603

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144541

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507983

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-20

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB NL SE

1998-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980324

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB NL SE

1996-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950614

1996-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB NL SE