Global Patent Index - EP 0692560 B1

EP 0692560 B1 2000-05-03 - Procedure for a drafting unit, in particular in carding machines, and regulating device

Title (en)

Procedure for a drafting unit, in particular in carding machines, and regulating device

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Regulieren eines Streckwerkes, insbesondere an Karden, und Reguliervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour réguler un système d'étirage, en particulier sur une machine de cardage, et dispositif pour réguler

Publication

EP 0692560 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95110618 A

Priority

DE 4424091 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0692560A1] A drafting system, esp. on a card, compares measurements at the input (3) with a set value and uses the difference to control a motor (52) driving the output rollers (5). The set values are located at an address in a set value register (6321). The base speed is derived from the doffer (631) speed and is fed as a base voltage signal to the motor (52). One of the drafting system rollers provides a low frequency timing impulse so that at every impulse a measurement is taken, converted to a digital signal and compared with a set value. The difference is calculated and used to locate an address in a correction register (613). The correction value is read and fed to the motor controller (53). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0692560 A1 19960117; EP 0692560 B1 20000503; DE 4424091 A1 19960118; US 5815889 A 19981006; WO 9601917 A1 19960125

INPADOC legal status


2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-11-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH GB IT LI

2000-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CSM-SAECHSISCHE SPINNEREIMASCHINEN GMBH

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980907

1996-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960704

1996-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH GB IT LI