Global Patent Index - EP 0692561 B1

EP 0692561 B1 2000-05-03 - Method for breaking a roving in preparation for automatic removal of bobbins from spindle banks and pressing finger for carrying out this method

Title (en)

Method for breaking a roving in preparation for automatic removal of bobbins from spindle banks and pressing finger for carrying out this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum unterbrechen der Faserlunte als Voraussetzung für das automatische abheben der Spulen auf Spindelbänken und Pressfinger zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de casse de la mèche en vue de la levée automatique des bobines sur des bancs à broches et doigt presseur mis en oeuvre par ce procédé

Publication

EP 0692561 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95440038 A

Priority

FR 9408883 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0692561A1] To sever the slubbing at a bobbin for automatic bobbin (1) doffing at the spindle rail, to allow the operative to grip the slubbing end and secure it, the slubbing is brought down to the bottom of the bobbin (1) at the end of winding. The slubbing is wound several times round the bobbin base and then brought upwards into a restricted over-winding. It is then brought down to sever the slubbing at the upper part of the bobbin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 9/16; D01H 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/32 (2006.01); D01H 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0692561 A1 19960117; EP 0692561 B1 20000503; DE 69516590 D1 20000608; DE 69516590 T2 20010222; FR 2722513 A1 19960119; FR 2722513 B1 19960830; JP 2928472 B2 19990803; JP H0860459 A 19960305; US 5575141 A 19961119

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516590 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-05-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000503

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980907

1997-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: N. SCHLUMBERGER ET CIE., S.A.

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960618

1996-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT