Global Patent Index - EP 0692572 B1

EP 0692572 B1 2000-12-27 - Rail construction

Title (en)

Rail construction

Title (de)

Schienenanordnung

Title (fr)

Construction de rail

Publication

EP 0692572 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95110451 A

Priority

DE 9411550 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0692572A1] A rail for a permanent way laid on a concrete bed, without ballast, and partic. for urban train and tramways, has an acoustic shrouding (13) fitted to the rail profile (12). The shroud is a one-piece unit profiled body, angled upwards. It forms a groove (14) at the rail head zone (4) with a depth sufficient to accommodate the wheel flange (2), and extends to a point (15) above the head (4) of the rail, without touching the wheels (1) of the rolling stock. The whole profile body is of a weather-resistant material e.g. based on EPDM, and the interior of the pointed end can be cladded with a layer e.g. a mineral felting or a foamed plastic. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 9/60 (2006.01); E01B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 9/60 (2013.01); E01B 19/003 (2013.01); E01B 2204/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29510853 U1 19951019; AT 198364 T 20010115; EP 0692572 A1 19960117; EP 0692572 B1 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050705

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030705

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2003-07-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030705

2003-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030705

2002-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020705

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020513

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-02-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508918 20010201

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198364 T 20010115

1998-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980415

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960307

1996-04-10 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1996-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL