Global Patent Index - EP 0692682 B1

EP 0692682 B1 2000-03-01 - Boiler device in particular of the so-called combined type with prompt delivery of hot sanitary water

Title (en)

Boiler device in particular of the so-called combined type with prompt delivery of hot sanitary water

Title (de)

Kesselvorrichtung, insbesondere Kombikessel mit unmittelbarer Abgabe von heissem Brauchwasser

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chaudière, en particulier chaudière mixte avec délivrance instantanée d'eau chaude sanitaire

Publication

EP 0692682 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95201798 A

Priority

IT MI941487 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0692682A1] A boiler, in particular of the so-called combined type, comprises a first gas-water heat exchanger (4) for producing hot water for space heating in heat exchange relationship, by means of a primary piping system (5), with a second water-water heat exchanger (7) for producing hot sanitary water, as well as a storage and expansion unit (8) for the hot primary water in fluid communication with the second water-water heat exchanger (7). Advantageously, the boiler allows a prompt delivery of hot sanitary water although having limited weight and size. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/08; F24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/08 (2006.01); F24D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/1069 (2013.01); F24D 3/08 (2013.01); F24D 3/1008 (2013.01); F24D 3/1016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0692682 A1 19960117; EP 0692682 B1 20000301; DE 69515220 D1 20000406; DE 69515220 T2 20001109; ES 2146286 T3 20000801; IT 1271673 B 19970604; IT MI941487 A1 19960116; IT MI941487 D0 19940715

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20020810

2002-05-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-02-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010701

2002-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-07-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-07-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010701

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000908

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146286 T3

2000-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000731

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-07-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000721

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-06-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000629

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2000-04-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000413

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515220 20000406

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GIANNONI S.P.A.

1998-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971211

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960712

1996-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL