Global Patent Index - EP 0692745 B1

EP 0692745 B1 2000-05-10 - Process cartridge and image forming apparatus usable therewith

Title (en)

Process cartridge and image forming apparatus usable therewith

Title (de)

Arbeitseinheit und Bilderzeugungsgerät mit einer solchen Einheit

Title (fr)

Unité de traitement et appareil de formation d'images utilisant une telle unité

Publication

EP 0692745 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95202631 A

Priority

  • EP 91402953 A
  • JP 30177990 A
  • JP 5444691 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0485271A2] A process cartridge detachably mountable to an image forming apparatus includes an image bearing member; process device actable on the image bearing member; a first frame containing the image bearing member and the process device; and a second frame engageable with and disengageable from the first frame and containing a developer container. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00; G03G 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 21/181 (2013.01); G03G 21/1817 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00987 (2013.01); G03G 2221/1633 (2013.01); G03G 2221/1648 (2013.01); G03G 2221/1651 (2013.01); G03G 2221/1654 (2013.01); G03G 2221/1669 (2013.01); G03G 2221/1853 (2013.01); G03G 2221/1876 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

JP H02257146 A 19901017 - CANON KK

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0485271 A2 19920513; EP 0485271 A3 19920909; EP 0485271 B1 19970723; CN 1040045 C 19980930; CN 1060271 C 20010103; CN 1062795 A 19920715; CN 1066271 C 20010523; CN 1066546 C 20010530; CN 1099879 A 19950308; CN 1114432 A 19960103; CN 1125855 A 19960703; DE 69126947 D1 19970828; DE 69126947 T2 19971120; DE 69132193 D1 20000615; DE 69132193 T2 20000928; DE 69132410 D1 20001012; DE 69132410 T2 20010215; EP 0692745 A2 19960117; EP 0692745 A3 19961120; EP 0692745 B1 20000510; EP 0692746 A2 19960117; EP 0692746 A3 19961120; EP 0692746 B1 20000906; HK 1011754 A1 20001208; HK 1011755 A1 20010504; KR 970001198 B1 19970129; SG 79187 A1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101105

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69132193

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101105

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091105

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091204

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69132193 20000615

2000-05-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 485271

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971107

1996-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951012

1996-01-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 485271

1996-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT