Global Patent Index - EP 0692778 B1

EP 0692778 B1 2001-12-19 - Method of controlling an electron source in a field emission device for a cold cathode field emission display

Title (en)

Method of controlling an electron source in a field emission device for a cold cathode field emission display

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Steuern einer Elektronenquelle in einer Feldemissions-Electronquelle für Kaltkathodenfeldemissions-Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Méthode de commande d'une source d'électrons dans un cathode à emission de champ et affichage à emission de champ

Publication

EP 0692778 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95109711 A

Priority

US 26898794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5477110A] A digital video word (14) that is utilized to specify an image to be displayed by a field emission device is divided into a plurality of digital subwords (16, 17). Each digital subword (16, 17) is utilized to create a control signal (21, 22) that is applied to an input (23, 26, 32, 33) of a drive source (24, 27, 31). The digital subwords (16, 17) divide the control signals (21, 22) into time slots wherein each time slot has a duration that is greater than the duration of time slots represented by the original digital video word (14). In response to the control signals (21, 22) the drive source (24, 27, 31) provides a drive signal (28, 34) that has an output value and duration that is controlled by the duration of the control signals, and by an active and inactive state encoded by the control signals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/68 (2006.01); G09G 1/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/22 (2006.01); H01J 1/304 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/22 (2013.01); G09G 3/2011 (2013.01); G09G 3/2014 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0479450 A2 19920408 - RAYTHEON CO [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5477110 A 19951219; EP 0692778 A1 19960117; EP 0692778 B1 20011219; JP H0822261 A 19960123; TW 286394 B 19960921

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070101

2005-06-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050602

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR NL

2000-11-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF CONTROLLING AN ELECTRON SOURCE IN A FIELD EMISSION DEVICE FOR A COLD CATHODE FIELD EMISSION DISPLAY

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990208

1996-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960717

1996-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR NL