Global Patent Index - EP 0693002 B2

EP 0693002 B2 2001-05-02 - METHODS FOR PRODUCING HIGH GLOSS RADIATON CURABLE COATINGS

Title (en)

METHODS FOR PRODUCING HIGH GLOSS RADIATON CURABLE COATINGS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCH-GLÄNZEND, STRAHLUNGHÄRTBAREN BESCHICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES D'OBTENTION DE REVETEMENTS DURCIS PAR RAYONNEMENT D'UNE HAUTE BRILLANCE

Publication

EP 0693002 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 94912806 A

Priority

  • US 9402939 W
  • US 4109393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9422596A1] High gloss finishes cured by electron beam without the need for a fully inert atmosphere are attained by providing a coating composition having a non-volatile photoinitiator and a flow control agent. In the method of producing the high gloss finishes, the coating is first exposed to electron beam in air or a partially inert atmosphere, then exposed to ultraviolet radiation in an essentially inert atmosphere.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 131/00; B05D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/067 (2013.01); B05D 3/068 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9422596 A1 19941013; AT 159276 T 19971115; CA 2156293 A1 19941013; CA 2156293 C 19981201; DE 69406278 D1 19971120; DE 69406278 T2 19980430; DE 69406278 T3 20010927; DK 0693002 T3 19980602; EP 0693002 A1 19960124; EP 0693002 B1 19971015; EP 0693002 B2 20010502; ES 2109687 T3 19980116; ES 2109687 T5 20010901; GR 3025646 T3 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050318

2004-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-08 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-10-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-10-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-03-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-03-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-09-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-08-17 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-08-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-07-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-06-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM * AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-05-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-04-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010410

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010406

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20010330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20010329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-16 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20010316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010307

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-07 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010307

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-06 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010306

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010306

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010306

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-05 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010302

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-31 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHODS FOR PRODUCING HIGH GLOSS RADIATON CURABLE COATINGS

2000-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.

2000-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DUPONT PERFORMANCE COATINGS GMBH & CO.KG

2000-10-11 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC. * 19980709 D

- Effective date: 19980707

2000-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.

2000-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DUPONT PERFORMANCE COATINGS GMBH & CO. KG

2000-05-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC. * 19980709 D

- Effective date: 19980707

2000-02-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

1999-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PPG INDUSTRIES OHIO, INC.

1999-09-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

1999-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PPG INDUSTRIES OHIO, INC.

1999-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

1999-08-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. TRANSFER- PPG INDUSTRIES OHIO

1999-07-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PPG INDUSTRIES OHIO, INC.

1998-11-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.

1998-11-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HERBERTS GMBH

1998-09-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-09-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HERBERTS GMBH

- Effective date: 19980709

1998-08-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-06-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1998-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1998-01-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 19971017

1998-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2109687 T3

1997-12-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

1997-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69406278 19971120

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1997-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

1997-10-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19971015

1997-10-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 159276 T 19971115

1996-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960610

1996-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950927

1996-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE