Global Patent Index - EP 0693020 B1

EP 0693020 B1 2000-03-22 - IMPROVEMENTS IN CARTON BLANKING UNITS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN CARTON BLANKING UNITS

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN AN VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KARTONZUSCHNITTEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES A DES ORGANES DE DECOUPAGE D'EBAUCHES DE BOITES EN CARTON

Publication

EP 0693020 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94913366 A

Priority

  • GB 9307211 A
  • US 9403732 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9422644A1] A blanking unit (10, 10a) for striking carton blanks from a sheet(s) of material comprises a top blanking frame (12) and a bottom blanking frame (14). The top blanking frame is vertically reciprocal relative to the bottom blanking frame so as to strike blanks from the sheet material when interposed between the frames. The bottom frame is formed with cutting edges (W1-W6; R1, R2) to shear through the sheet and the top frame is furnished with a number of profile plates (P1-P4) one for each blank (B1-B4) to be struck. Each profile plate conforms substantially to the general profile of the blank it is to strike and is adjustable in relation to that blank and relative to the remainder of the sheet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/553; B26D 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/553 (2006.01); B26D 7/18 (2006.01); B26F 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/1818 (2013.01); B26D 7/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9422644 A1 19941013; AT 190893 T 20000415; AU 6555694 A 19941024; AU 682180 B2 19970925; CA 2159902 A1 19941013; CN 1044217 C 19990721; CN 1123012 A 19960522; CZ 287015 B6 20000816; CZ 9502612 A3 19960417; DE 69423614 D1 20000427; DE 69423614 T2 20000713; DK 0693020 T3 20000703; EP 0693020 A1 19960124; EP 0693020 A4 19960717; EP 0693020 B1 20000322; ES 2144518 T3 20000616; FI 112335 B 20031128; FI 954740 A0 19951005; FI 954740 A 19951205; GB 9307211 D0 19930526; GR 3033320 T3 20000929; HU 214997 B 19980828; HU 9502914 D0 19951228; HU T72690 A 19960528; JP H08508451 A 19960910; NO 308512 B1 20000925; NO 953966 A 19951027; NO 953966 D0 19951005; NZ 265188 A 19970922; PL 173966 B1 19980529; PL 310999 A1 19960122; PT 693020 E 20000630; RU 2126319 C1 19990220; SK 124995 A3 19960807

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-05-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2005-04-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-03-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030407

2004-02-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-01-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030405

2003-11-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *MEAD CORP.

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-04-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-04-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030406

2003-04-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030405

2003-04-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030405

2002-04-02 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020402

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20020329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-20 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020320

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020319

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020318

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-14 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020311

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020307

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020305

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-06-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144518 T3

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423614 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190893 T 20000415

1998-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980409

1996-07-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19960529

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1996-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951103

1996-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE