Global Patent Index - EP 0693277 B1

EP 0693277 B1 2001-05-16 - Use of a solution or liquid dispersion for the manufacture of a medicament for occluding a lacrimal canaliculi

Title (en)

Use of a solution or liquid dispersion for the manufacture of a medicament for occluding a lacrimal canaliculi

Title (de)

Verwendung einer Infusionslösung oder -dispersion zur Herstellung eines Medikaments zur Absperrung der Tränenkanäle

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'une solution ou d'une dispersion perfusable pour préparer un médicament pour obstruer des canaux lacrimaux

Publication

EP 0693277 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95109708 A

Priority

JP 14362394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0693277A1] A method of obstructing the lacrimal canaliculi by infusing therein a solution or liquid dispersion containing a gel forming material, such having collagen as the main ingredient in the range of 1 mg/ml to 70 mg/ml for improving the symptoms of dry eye. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/08 (2006.01); A61F 9/007 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61L 31/04 (2006.01); A61L 31/14 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 31/145 (2013.01); A61F 9/00772 (2013.01); A61L 31/041 (2013.01); A61L 31/043 (2013.01); A61L 31/044 (2013.01); A61L 2430/16 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61L 31/145 + A61L 31/043 + A61L 31/046 + A61L 31/045 + A61L 31/044 + A61F 9/00
  2. A61L 31/041 + A61L 31/145 + C08L 89/06 + C08L 5/08 + C08L 5/00
  3. A61L 31/041 + C08L 89/06

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0693277 A1 19960124; EP 0693277 B1 20010516; DE 69520912 D1 20010621; DE 69520912 T2 20011025; JP 3486758 B2 20040113; JP H0812592 A 19960116; US 5840054 A 19981124

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110622

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120101

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69520912

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110622

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110622

2012-01-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120101

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100616

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100616

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100603

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100709

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520912 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-04-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-03-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF A SOLUTION OR LIQUID DISPERSION FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR OCCLUDING A LACRIMAL CANALICULI

2000-03-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF A SOLUTION OR LIQUID DISPERSION FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR OCCLUDING A LACRIMAL CANALICULI

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990128

1996-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960621

1996-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL