Global patent index - EP 0693379 B1

EP 0693379 B1 2000-06-07 - Method for manufacturing an ink jet recording head

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing an ink jet recording head

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren für einen Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopf

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication pour une tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0693379 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95110506 A

Priority

JP 15728794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0693379A2] An ink jet recording head is formed by the steps of dipping a cavity pattern member alternately in a solution of an electrode material and in a solution of a piezoelectric material, with a drying step interposed therebetween, to form a unitary body of the cavity pattern member and a laminate of the electric material and the piezoelectric material, and removing the cavity pattern member from the unitary body to form an ink cavity inside the laminate. The ink cavity has a circular cross-section and has a dimensional accuracy. The piezoelectric films can apply a uniform pressure for jetting of ink. A simple process for manufacturing the ink jet recording head reduces the costs thereof. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1631 (2013.01); B41J 2/14209 (2013.01); B41J 2/1429 (2013.01); B41J 2/1609 (2013.01); B41J 2/1615 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0693379 A2 19960124; EP 0693379 A3 19970312; EP 0693379 B1 20000607; DE 69517367 D1 20000713; DE 69517367 T2 20001012; JP H0820109 A 19960123

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080201

2006-07-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060716

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517367

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2000-05-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN INK JET RECORDING HEAD

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980805

1997-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970129

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

1997-03-05 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: B41J 2/14

1996-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL