Global Patent Index - EP 0693453 B1

EP 0693453 B1 2001-05-23 - Building site lift

Title (en)

Building site lift

Title (de)

Bauaufzug

Title (fr)

Ascenseur de chantier

Publication

EP 0693453 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95111384 A

Priority

DE 4426071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0693453A2] The lift has a lift mask along which the lift cage (10) is moved in the vertical direction, with displacement of the lift cage in the horizontal direction to and from the building (4), or the scaffolding structure (3), when the required level is reached. The lift cage is displaced horizontally along a horizontal guide rail, with the door at the front of the lift cage prevented from being opened until the lift cage reaches the horizontal end position. Pref. an end switch is operated when the latter is reached. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 9/187; B66F 11/04; E04G 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/187 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/187 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0693453 A2 19960124; EP 0693453 A3 19960410; EP 0693453 B1 20010523; AT 201381 T 20010615; DE 4426071 A1 19960125; DE 4426071 C2 19970904

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59509274

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140804

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BOECKER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BOECKER MASCHINENWERKE GMBH, 59368 WERNE, DE

- Document: DE 59509274

- Effective date: 20121107

2012-12-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59509274

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MEINKE, DABRINGHAUS, DE

- Effective date: 20121107

2012-11-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59509274

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MEINKE, DABRINGHAUS, DE

2005-07-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040721

2003-07-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030721

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-07-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-08-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010822

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-08-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010807

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509274 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201381 T 20010615

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991119

1996-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960524

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE