Global Patent Index - EP 0693545 B1

EP 0693545 B1 2000-01-12 - Wood gas producer

Title (en)

Wood gas producer

Title (de)

Holzgaserzeuger

Title (fr)

Gazogène à bois

Publication

EP 0693545 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95111130 A

Priority

DE 9411856 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0693545A1] A lower ring mantle and the gasifying chamber outer well form an annular chamber from which the gas is drawn off. Air is drawn in above the nozzle ring. The gas ring channel (11) runs through nearly 360 degrees and is located within the nozzle ring (3). The ring channel has an inlet (13) from the ring chamber (10), and its outlet (14) is connected to an outlet channel (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/26 (2013.01); C10J 3/42 (2013.01); C10J 2300/092 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 9411856 U1 19940922; AT 188727 T 20000115; EP 0693545 A1 19960124; EP 0693545 B1 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-07-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020715

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010907

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VIESEL MANFRED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000822

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507594 20000217

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL

2000-01-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188727 T 20000115

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980728

1996-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960705

1996-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL