Global Patent Index - EP 0693595 B1

EP 0693595 B1 2000-10-18 - Floor structure for portable unit

Title (en)

Floor structure for portable unit

Title (de)

Bodenaufbau für transportfähige Einheiten

Title (fr)

Structure de planches pour cellule transportable

Publication

EP 0693595 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95305139 A

Priority

GB 9414682 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0693595A2] A floor structure in or for a portable building unit, the floor structure comprising a floor frame comprising a pair of side beams interconnected together by transversely extending joists, a floor panel supported on the floor frame, an underdrawing and insulation material disposed between the floor panel and the underdrawing, characterised in that the underdrawing comprises a sheet spaced from the floor panel with the joists disposed between the floor panel and the underdrawing sheet and thermally insulating material disposed between the floor panel and the underdrawing sheet. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/348; E04H 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/348 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/3483 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0693595 A2 19960124; EP 0693595 A3 19960918; EP 0693595 B1 20001018; DE 69519136 D1 20001123; DE 69519136 T2 20010301; GB 2291446 A 19960124; GB 2291446 B 19971224; GB 9414682 D0 19940907; GB 9515016 D0 19950920

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PORTAKABIN LTD

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519136 20001123

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

2000-05-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980415

1998-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980415

1997-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961209

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1996-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL