Global Patent Index - EP 0693656 B1

EP 0693656 B1 2000-08-30 - Cartridge type oil tank

Title (en)

Cartridge type oil tank

Title (de)

Kartuschenförmiger Ölbehälter

Title (fr)

Réservoir d'huile du type cartouche

Publication

EP 0693656 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95107396 A

Priority

JP 988694 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0693656A2] Cartridge type oil tank in which an oil cap (7) mounted on a body unit (8) pivoting around a shaft (25) is in contact with a mouth (3) of a tank body (1) for supplying oil when mounted on an oil pan (41) upside down, and which comprises locking means (38) comprising a hook (33) and a locking rod (29) both for holding and releasing the contact between the oil cap (7) and the mouth (3). An oil gauge for showing the oil filling condition of the tank is placed near the locking means (38). Accordingly, the tank is filled with oil while the body unit (8) is raised from the mouth (3), and the tank is filled with oil smoothly without making a user's hand dirty. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23K 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0693656 A2 19960124; EP 0693656 A3 19960724; EP 0693656 B1 20000830; DE 69518594 T2 20010419; ES 2149906 T3 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150516

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-05-20 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150515

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140510

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69518594

- Effective date: 20121201

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-04-21 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149906 T3

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518594 20001005

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR NL

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990202

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970116

1996-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR NL

1996-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR NL