Global Patent Index - EP 0693763 B1

EP 0693763 B1 2000-04-26 - M.T. electrical switches

Title (en)

M.T. electrical switches

Title (de)

Mittelspannung elektrischer Schalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteurs électriques moyenne tension

Publication

EP 0693763 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95410067 A

Priority

FR 9409198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0693763A1] The switch includes an envelope (E) enclosing a pole, and first and second main fixed contacts (1a,2a) situated along the length of the internal wall of the envelope. These contact cooperate with two main mobile contacts (5a,6a) carried by a conductor bridge (4) which is able to rotate. The switch also includes a vacuum (D) containing a fixed contact (9) and a mobile contact (10). One of these contacts (10) is connected to one (1a) of the fixed contacts of the main switch, whilst the other is temporarily connected to the bridge (4) by the switching device (7,16). The sequential operation of the contacts ensures the use of the vacuum contact breaker at the required time. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/12; H01H 33/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/12 (2006.01); H01H 33/666 (2006.01); H01H 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/6661 (2013.01); H01H 33/122 (2013.01); H01H 31/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0693763 A1 19960124; EP 0693763 B1 20000426; DE 69516461 D1 20000531; DE 69516461 T2 20001012; FR 2722912 A1 19960126; FR 2722912 B1 19960913

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2004-07-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040709

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030704

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2003-07-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030704

2002-07-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020703

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516461 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990624

1996-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960723

1996-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL