Global Patent Index - EP 0693805 B1

EP 0693805 B1 2000-10-25 - Joining element for an electrical and mechanical connection with turnable terminals to a protective tube system for electrical wirings

Title (en)

Joining element for an electrical and mechanical connection with turnable terminals to a protective tube system for electrical wirings

Title (de)

Anschlusselement für eine elektrische und mechanische Verbindung mit drehbeweglichen Anschlüssen an ein Schutzschlauchsystem für elektrische Leitungen

Title (fr)

Elément de raccord pour la connexion électrique et mécanique avec éléments de connexion rotatifs pour gaine de protection de conducteurs électriques

Publication

EP 0693805 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95110317 A

Priority

DE 4425868 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0693805A2] A hollow cylindrical body (1) fitted over a coaxial support (2) has an axially complete zone (1.1) and a slotted zone (1.2) comprising a number of flexible elements which function as electrically conductive contact springs. The support has an axial extension (2.1) of greater dia. on which a threaded nut (16) is held captive by a separate snap-ring (4). The body and support are held in conductive contact by the mechanical pressure on the contact springs, which is distributed along the central axis (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64D 45/00 (2006.01); B64D 45/02 (2006.01); H01R 35/00 (2006.01); H01R 35/04 (2006.01); H02G 3/06 (2006.01); H05K 9/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/658 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 35/00 (2013.01); H01R 13/6583 (2013.01); H01R 13/6593 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0693805 A2 19960124; EP 0693805 A3 19970219; EP 0693805 B1 20001025; DE 4447502 A1 19960307; DE 4447502 C2 19990916; ES 2152347 T3 20010201; JP H0870521 A 19960312; US 5616887 A 19970401

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2013-06-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130605

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110703

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508803

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110703

2012-03-06 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-02-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100722

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100715

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100714

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152347 T3

2001-01-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: EADS AIRBUS GMBH

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508803 20001130

2000-11-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EADS AIRBUS GMBH

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL SE

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1999-03-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AEROSPACE AIRBUS GESELLSCHAFT MIT

1997-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970819

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL SE

1996-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL SE