Global Patent Index - EP 0694347 B1

EP 0694347 B1 2000-10-11 - Turret punch press

Title (en)

Turret punch press

Title (de)

Revolverstanzmaschine

Title (fr)

Poinçonneuse à tourelle revolver

Publication

EP 0694347 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95114957 A

Priority

  • EP 92403431 A
  • US 80758691 A
  • US 83886792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0555604A2] A turret punch press wherein the upper and lower turrets are rotated, and the upper die positioned in the processing position is struck by a piston rod (striker element) of a striker device mounted on the lower end of a ram when the ram is lowered by means of a crank shaft (mechanical vertically moving means). The piston rod can be freely moved vertically by a hydraulic cylinder so that the amount of the stroke of the striker element with respect to the upper die is the sum of the amount of the stroke of the ram and the amount of the stroke of the piston rod in the hydraulic cylinder itself. Accordingly, the upper die and the lower die come into contact and the processing occurs only when the ram and the piston rod are both at bottom dead center. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 28/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/02 (2006.01); B21D 28/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/02 (2013.01); B21D 28/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0555604 A2 19930818; EP 0555604 A3 19931222; EP 0555604 B1 19960424; CA 2085545 A1 19930617; DE 69210210 D1 19960530; DE 69210210 T2 19961031; DE 69231504 D1 20001116; DE 69231504 T2 20010510; EP 0694347 A1 19960131; EP 0694347 B1 20001011; FI 106187 B 20001215; FI 112452 B 20031215; FI 20001969 A 20000906; FI 925689 A0 19921215; FI 925689 A 19930617

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20121215

2013-01-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20121215

2012-12-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69231504

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-12-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69231504

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111212

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69231504

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-16

2000-11-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 555604

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980407

1996-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960724

1996-01-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 555604

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1996-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT