Global Patent Index - EP 0694348 B1

EP 0694348 B1 2000-11-15 - Method and press for producing large tubes from metal sheet

Title (en)

Method and press for producing large tubes from metal sheet

Title (de)

Arbeitsverfahren und Presse zum Herstellen von Grossrohren aus Blechtafeln

Title (fr)

Méthode et presse pour la fabrication des grands tubes à partir de tôles

Publication

EP 0694348 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95250147 A

Priority

DE 4426800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0694348A1] Method for the mfr. of large bore pipes from steel plates uses an appts comprising a pipe press plant equipped with tooling for forming the steel plate into a slotted pipe, whereby the operations edge bending, pipe forming, sizing and straightening are carried out in sequence in the same press after interchange of the appropriate tooling. Press equipment is also claimed. It has interchangeable edge bending, forming, sizing and straightening tools on the hydraulic press slide (4) and a manipulator (11,12) for tool changing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 37/14; B21D 5/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/08 (2006.01); B21D 5/01 (2006.01); B21D 37/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/015 (2013.01); B21D 37/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0694348 A1 19960131; EP 0694348 B1 20001115; CZ 289821 B6 20020417; CZ 9501854 A3 19960417; DE 4426800 A1 19960201

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050620

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2002-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020611

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020603

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508854 20001221

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1998-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980604

1996-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960125

1996-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL