Global patent index - EP 0694356 B1

EP 0694356 B1 2000-03-01 - Method and apparatus for correcting the crown of the rolls in continuous casting of metal strips

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for correcting the crown of the rolls in continuous casting of metal strips

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Korrektion der Bombierung der Stranggiesswalzen für Metallband

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de correction de l'ovalisation de cylindres de coulée continue de bande métallique

Publication

EP 0694356 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95420218 A

Priority

FR 9409667 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0694356A1] The cooling of two counter-rotating strip casting rolls, which tend to become oval as a result of unequal cooling of their circumferences and consists of a roll body (1) and a cylindrical shell (2), involves introducing cooling fluid through axial inlet channels (3) passing through radial channels (4) into longitudinal collector grooves (5) and then into circumferential cooling grooves next to the shell (2), through collector grooves (7) and radial channels (8) to reach the outlet channels (9), and leave the roll. By means of a pipe and three-way valve system, the flow direction of cooling fluid is periodically reversed so that the roles of the axial channels (3) and (9) are exchanged. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06; B21B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B21B 27/08 (2006.01); B22D 11/055 (2006.01); B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B22D 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0682 (2013.01); B21B 27/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0694356 A1 19960131; EP 0694356 B1 20000301; AT 189982 T 20000315; BR 9503511 A 19960730; CZ 290735 B6 20021016; CZ 9501957 A3 19960214; DE 69515225 D1 20000406; DE 69515225 T2 20000810; FR 2723014 A1 19960202; FR 2723014 B1 19960920; JP H0857598 A 19960305; KR 100200984 B1 19990615; NO 310396 B1 20010702; NO 952681 A 19960130; NO 952681 D0 19950706; RU 2138362 C1 19990927; TW 282426 B 19960801; US 5642772 A 19970701

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050726

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030726

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030726

2003-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030726

2002-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PECHINEY RHENALU

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-10-20 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN4

2000-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-04-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69515225

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU SE

2000-03-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189982

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980302

1996-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960213

1996-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU SE