Global Patent Index - EP 0694625 B9

EP 0694625 B9 2001-12-05 - HIGH TENSION ALLOYED MOLTEN ZINC-PLATED STEEL PLATE HAVING EXCELLENT PLATING CHARACTERISTICS AND METHOD OFF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (en)

HIGH TENSION ALLOYED MOLTEN ZINC-PLATED STEEL PLATE HAVING EXCELLENT PLATING CHARACTERISTICS AND METHOD OFF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (de)

HOCHFESTE FEUERVERZINKTE STAHLPLATTE MIT HERVORRAGENDEN PLATTIERUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

TOLE D'ACIER REVETUE DE ZINC ALLIE FONDU SOUS HAUTE TENSION, A EXCELLENTES CARACTERISTIQUES DE ZINGAGE, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0694625 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 95907877 A

Priority

  • JP 9500196 W
  • JP 1836494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9521947A1] A high tension alloyed molten zinc-plated steel plate having excellent press moldability and plating characteristics, wherein Si is utilized as a reinforcing component, the mutual relation between Si and Mn being specified, an alloying rate of a layer of plating of alloyed zinc being specified, characterized in that: the plated steel has a layer of plating of alloyed molten zinc containing 9-12 % of Fe on a surface of a steel plate containing 0.0005-0.0050 mass % of C, 0.1-2.5 mass % of Si, 0.1-2.5 mass % of Mn, 0.003-0.10 mass % of Ti, 0.0030-0.10 mass % of Nb, 0.0005-0.0080 mass % of B, 0.040-0.18 mass % of P, not more than 0.015 mass % of S, 0.005-0.10 mass % of Al, not more than 0.0060 mass % of N, Si and Mn in amounts satisfying the relation of the following expression, and the remainder substantially comprising an Fe composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/14; B32B 15/01; C23C 2/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 15/01 (2006.01); C23C 2/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 15/013 (2013.01); C23C 2/28 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12799 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12951 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9521947 A1 19950817; DE 69521459 D1 20010802; DE 69521459 T2 20020328; EP 0694625 A1 19960131; EP 0694625 A4 19960626; EP 0694625 B1 20010627; EP 0694625 B9 20011205; US 5882803 A 19990316

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-10 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20030918

2004-03-10 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20030918

2003-12-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JFE STEEL CORPORATION

2003-02-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69521459 20010802

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981117

1996-06-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951006

1996-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB