Global Patent Index - EP 0694730 B1

EP 0694730 B1 2001-12-19 - Burner

Title (en)

Burner

Title (de)

Brenner

Title (fr)

Bruleur

Publication

EP 0694730 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810443 A

Priority

DE 4426353 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0694730A2] The burner (100) consists basically of at least two hollow conical part bodies (101,102) movable relative to each other in the flow direction. The longitudinal axes of symmetry of these bodies are offset. Their adjacent walls form tangential air intake slits in the longitudinal direction to take combustion airflow (115) into the internal space (114) of the burner. The thorough flow cross-section of the tangential slits decreases in the flow direction of the burner, with a stabilising effect on the backflow zone (106) at the exit from the burner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/40; F23R 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/30 (2006.01); F23C 1/08 (2006.01); F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/002 (2013.01); F23D 11/402 (2013.01); F23D 17/002 (2013.01); F23R 3/12 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0694730 A2 19960131; EP 0694730 A3 19980506; EP 0694730 B1 20011219; CN 1118859 A 19960320; DE 4426353 A1 19960201; JP H08189611 A 19960723; US 5562441 A 19961008

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509959 20020131

2002-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2001-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010226

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981012

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

1996-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE