Global Patent Index - EP 0694746 B1

EP 0694746 B1 2000-04-19 - Process for the production of a gas under pressure in variable quantities

Title (en)

Process for the production of a gas under pressure in variable quantities

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Druckgas mit variabelen Mengen

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'un gaz sous pression à débit variable

Publication

EP 0694746 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401774 A

Priority

FR 9409481 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0694746A1] A process and installation are claimed for the production of a gas under pressure, at a variable flow rate, particularly for the distillation of air to produce oxygen and nitrogen streams. Air is distilled in a distillation column (7) after cooling by heat exchange (6) with distillation products. Liquid oxygen is withdrawn from the column (16 and 17) and stored (11) at near atmospheric pressure, then used at a variable rate (12). Liquified air is stored (13) at a pressure higher than that in the distillation column before use. It is fed to the column as needed via a pressure reducing valve (25). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/02 (2006.01); F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04175 (2013.01); F25J 3/04236 (2013.01); F25J 3/04296 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04509 (2013.01); Y10S 62/913 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0694746 A1 19960131; EP 0694746 B1 20000419; CA 2154984 A1 19960130; CN 1119607 C 20030827; CN 1154463 A 19970716; DE 69516339 D1 20000525; DE 69516339 T2 20000921; ES 2145885 T3 20000716; FR 2723184 A1 19960202; FR 2723184 B1 19960906; JP H08170875 A 19960702; KR 100394311 B1 20031022; US 5526647 A 19960618; ZA 9506332 B 19960311

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090726

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090726

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090726

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030728

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. L'*AIR LIQUIDE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030728

2002-07-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020724

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020705

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020619

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145885 T3

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516339 20000525

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980212

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960731

1996-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL