Global Patent Index - EP 0694989 B1

EP 0694989 B1 2001-01-17 - Terminal-processed structure of shielded cable and terminal-processing method of the same

Title (en)

Terminal-processed structure of shielded cable and terminal-processing method of the same

Title (de)

Anschlussstruktur eines abgeschirmten Kabels und dessen Anschlussverfahren

Title (fr)

Structure de connexion d'un câble blinde et méthode de connexion de celui-ci

Publication

EP 0694989 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95303794 A

Priority

JP 19796394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0694989A2] A terminal-processed structure of a shielded cable is so simple that the shielded cable becomes easy for use. In a shielded cable (10), core wires (12) covered by a first insulating layer (11) are sheathed by braided metallic wires (13) on the outer periphery thereof and are further covered by a second insulating layer (14) on the braided metallic wires (13). The braided metallic wires (13) are exposed at one end of the shielded cable (10). A hard sleeve-like body (20) is inserted beneath the exposed, braided metallic wires (13). A conductive sleeve like body (30) is crimped onto the exposed, braided metallic wires (13) on the one end of the shielded cable (10). The conductive sleeve-like body (30) crimped on the one end of the shielded cable (10) is attached to a conductive casing (40) by a conductive band (41) or ring (42) when the shielded cable (10) is used. Thus, the braided metallic wires (13) are electrically communicated with the casing (40). <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/00 (2006.01); H01R 9/03 (2006.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/034 (2013.01); H01R 9/0518 (2013.01); H01R 9/0515 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0694989 A2 19960131; EP 0694989 A3 19961127; EP 0694989 B1 20010117; DE 69519899 D1 20010222; DE 69519899 T2 20010517; JP H0845575 A 19960216

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100602

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100602

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090529

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69519899

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-22

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970418

1997-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970418

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950622

1996-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB