Global Patent Index - EP 0695278 B1

EP 0695278 B1 2001-12-19 - BOTTLED WATER STATION WITH REMOVABLE RESERVOIR AND MANIFOLDED SUPPORT PLATFORM

Title (en)

BOTTLED WATER STATION WITH REMOVABLE RESERVOIR AND MANIFOLDED SUPPORT PLATFORM

Title (de)

ABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLASCHENWASSER MIT ABNEHMBAREM VORRATSBEHÄLTER SOWIE TRÄGERPLATTFORM MIT VERTEILERLEITUNGEN

Title (fr)

POSTE DE DISTRIBUTION D'EAU EN BOUTEILLE A RESERVOIR AMOVIBLE ET PLATEFORME DE SUPPORT A TUBULURE

Publication

EP 0695278 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95911804 A

Priority

  • US 9502062 W
  • US 20272294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5390826A] An improved bottled water station is provided of the type including a removable reservoir for drop-in installation into a station housing, wherein the reservoir is adapted for slide-fit engagement with a manifolded support platform for coupling the reservoir to at least one temperature control device and to at least one faucet valve for dispensing. The reservoir is constructed, in the preferred form, from a molded plastic or the like to have an open upper end for receiving and supporting an inverted water supply bottle. The reservoir, upon drop-in installation into the station housing, is supported upon the manifolded support platform, wherein the reservoir and platform include mating slide-fit connectors for coupling the reservoir to temperature control devices such as a chiller probe for chilling water within the reservoir, and/or a hot water tank for heating a portion of the water coupling from the reservoir. The support platform also includes dispenser fittings for connection to faucet valves disposed at the front of the station housing for individual dispensing of water supplies at different temperatures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 3/00; B67D 5/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/08 (2006.01); B67D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 3/0035 (2013.01); B67D 1/0861 (2013.01); B67D 3/0009 (2013.01); B67D 3/0022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5390826 A 19950221; AU 1923595 A 19950911; AU 681265 B2 19970821; CA 2160586 A1 19950831; CA 2160586 C 20041214; DE 69524685 D1 20020131; DE 69524685 T2 20020613; EP 0695278 A1 19960207; EP 0695278 A4 19970402; EP 0695278 B1 20011219; ES 2165908 T3 20020401; JP H08509941 A 19961022; WO 9523115 A1 19950831

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070216

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070216

2006-02-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040217

2005-02-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2004-08-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040826

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-02-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165908 T3

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524685 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OASIS CORPORATION

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990128

1997-04-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19970211

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1997-03-19 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B67D 3/00

1996-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960208

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT