Global Patent Index - EP 0695451 B1

EP 0695451 B1 2000-05-03 - PROCESS FOR SCROLLING A PLURALITY OF RASTER LINES IN A WINDOW OF A PERSONAL COMPUTER DISPLAY SCREEN RUN IN GRAPHIC MODE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR SCROLLING A PLURALITY OF RASTER LINES IN A WINDOW OF A PERSONAL COMPUTER DISPLAY SCREEN RUN IN GRAPHIC MODE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SCROLLEN VON MEHREREN RASTERZEILEN IN EINEM FENSTER EINES IM GRAFIKMODUS BETRIEBENEN BILDSCHIRMS EINES PERSONALCOMPUTERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR FAIRE DEFILER PLUSIEURS LIGNES DE TRAMES DANS UNE FENETRE D'UN ECRAN D'UN MICRO-ORDINATEUR, FONCTIONNANT EN MODE GRAPHIQUE

Publication

EP 0695451 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95910402 A

Priority

  • DE 9500205 W
  • DE 4405330 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5801675A] PCT No. PCT/DE95/00205 Sec. 371 Date Jan. 18, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Jan. 18, 1996 PCT Filed Feb. 17, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO95/22814 PCT Pub. Date Aug. 24, 1995The invention relates to a procedure for scrolling some raster scan lines in a window of a screen operated in the graphic-mode of a personal computer. The computer has a processor and a program memory allocated to it as well as a video card connected to the processor via an external bus. The video card has a video memory (RAM), whose memory contents can be presented on the screen. One first line of the raster scan lines to be scrolled, is moved into a raster scan line within the window and is marked with a source-pointer. The raster scan line within a window, in which this line is to be moved into, is marked with a destination pointer. Afterwards, a scroll is performed and repeated until all lines to be scrolled are in raster scan lines of the window. At the same time with the first line, the subsequent third line is also at least scrolled in raster scan lines of the screen window. Afterwards, the second line and the fourth line of some raster scan lines to be scrolled are scrolled from lines in raster scan lines of the screen window and so on until all lines to be scrolled are scrolled in raster scan lines of the window.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 5/14; G09G 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/048 (2006.01); G06F 3/14 (2006.01); G09G 5/14 (2006.01); G09G 5/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/14 (2013.01); G09G 5/346 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0071725 A2 19830216 - IBM [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5801675 A 19980901; AT 192599 T 20000515; CN 1123578 A 19960529; DE 4405330 A1 19950824; EP 0695451 A1 19960207; EP 0695451 B1 20000503; ES 2149349 T3 20001101; JP H09511342 A 19971111; WO 9522814 A1 19950824

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-10-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-09-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-02-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-02-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-09-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-09-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MAXDATA SYSTEME GMBH;PHOENIX TECHNOLOGIES LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2002-04-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020416

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020402

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020402

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149349

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508244

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192599

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990916

1996-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960226

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE