Global Patent Index - EP 0695482 B1

EP 0695482 B1 2001-05-02 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CORRECTION AND LIMITATION OF TRANSMITTER POWER ON THE REVERSE LINK OF A MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONE SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CORRECTION AND LIMITATION OF TRANSMITTER POWER ON THE REVERSE LINK OF A MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONE SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR KORREKTUR UND BEGRENZUNG DER SENDELEISTUNG AUF DEN RÜCKKANAL EINES MOBILFUNKTELEFONSYSTEMS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CORRECTION ET DE LIMITATION DE LA PUISSANCE D'EMISSION SUR LA LIAISON INVERSE D'UN SYSTEME RADIOTELEPHONIQUE MOBILE

Publication

EP 0695482 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95911058 A

Priority

  • US 20315194 A
  • US 9502125 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9523460A1] The process and apparatus of the present invention limits the output power of a radiotelephone, operating in a cellular system in the preferred embodiment. This ensures the transmitted sidebands and synthesizer phase noise remains within a certain specification. This is accomplished by power detection and a correction accumulator that together generate a gain control signal by limiting the gain adjustment to a maximum value, even when the cell site communicating with the radiotelephone is sending power turn-up commands to the radiotelephone. This process includes dynamically correcting the output level of the transmitter due to gain variations in the transmitter stages or gain control elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/005

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/40 (2006.01); H04B 1/04 (2006.01); H04B 7/005 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04W 52/06 (2009.01); H04W 52/52 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 52/06 (2013.01); H04W 52/36 (2013.01); H04W 52/52 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0420508 A2 19910403 - NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9523460 A1 19950831; AT 200946 T 20010515; AU 1879795 A 19950911; AU 674475 B2 19961219; BR 9505674 A 19960116; CA 2158577 A1 19950831; CA 2158577 C 20000516; CN 1078022 C 20020116; CN 1123587 A 19960529; DE 69520812 D1 20010607; DE 69520812 T2 20020228; EP 0695482 A1 19960207; EP 0695482 B1 20010502; ES 2158088 T3 20010901; FI 112564 B 20031215; FI 955072 A0 19951025; FI 955072 A 19951222; HK 1011124 A1 20020208; JP 3452930 B2 20031006; JP H08510614 A 19961105; KR 100208456 B1 19990715; MX 9504538 A 19970531; RU 2134018 C1 19990727; US 5452473 A 19950919; US 5590408 A 19961231; US 5655220 A 19970805

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150216

2015-03-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-03-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150216

2015-02-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69520812

2015-02-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69520812

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140207

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-15 [REG GB S75Z] AMENDMENT OF PATENT IN INFRINGEMENT OR REVOCATION PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 75/PATENTS ACT 1977)

2008-07-23 [REG GB S75] AMENDMENT OF PATENT IN INFRINGEMENT OR REVOCATION PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE COMPTROLLER (SECT. 75/PATENTS ACT 1977)

2003-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-12-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-02-18 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-04 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20020204

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-11 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-09-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: QUALCOMM INCORPORATED

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158088 T3

2001-08-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-08-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-06-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520812 20010607

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19950928;SI PAYMENT 19950928

2001-05-02 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2001-05-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200946 T 20010515

1996-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960404

1996-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951116

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 950928;SI PAYMENT 950928

1996-02-07 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 950928;SI PAYMENT 950928