Global Patent Index - EP 0695520 B1

EP 0695520 B1 2000-12-20 - Hair treating apparatus with an infrared radiating element and a fan

Title (en)

Hair treating apparatus with an infrared radiating element and a fan

Title (de)

Haarbehandlungsgerät mit einem Infrarotstrahlerelement und einem Gebläse

Title (fr)

Appareil de traitement des cheveux avec élément de rayonnement infrarouge et une soufflante

Publication

EP 0695520 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95103529 A

Priority

DE 4427374 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0695520A1] The infrared radiant element (1) incorporates a reflector (3) encompassing two infrared discharge tubes (5) in a housing (2). The reflector is open at one side and backed by a duct (7) into which air (9) is drawn by the blower (8) through an inlet (10). The air is heated in passing between the back of the reflector and a sheet-metal guide (17), with laminar flow assisted by an insert (18). It is expelled through an outlet (11) protected by a grid (16), at a temp. sufficient for hair-drying.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 20/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 20/04 (2006.01); A45D 20/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 20/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0695520 A1 19960207; EP 0695520 B1 20001220; DE 4427374 A1 19960208; ES 2154689 T3 20010416; JP 3698272 B2 20050921; JP H08168410 A 19960702

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150312

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150310

2015-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150526

2015-04-01 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150310

2015-03-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59508905

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140313

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-03-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20120214

2012-03-16 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Effective date: 20120214

2012-03-13 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: WELLA GMBH

- Effective date: 20120301

2011-08-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WELLA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WELLA AG, 64295 DARMSTADT, DE

- Document: DE 59508905

- Effective date: 20110629

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154689 T3

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508905 20010125

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990304

1996-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950311

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT