Global Patent Index - EP 0695592 B1

EP 0695592 B1 2001-12-12 - Method and apparatus for making a metallic ondulated tube

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for making a metallic ondulated tube

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines metallischen Wellrohres

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour fabriquer un tube métallique ondulé

Publication

EP 0695592 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401575 A

Priority

FR 9409680 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0695592A1] The method for shaping a metal tube by electromagnetism is characterised by: (a) a section of a metal tube (2) being placed between a means (1) capable of producing a magnetic field and a means (4) with required surface shape; (b) the device (1) being electrically activated to produce a force which deforms the tube wall and presses it against the means (4); (c) the means (1) and (4) being displaced longitudinally into another position along the length of the tube for continuation of the shaping process. The appts. incorporates means for longitudinal displacement of the tube relative to the means (1, 4) for step-by-step shaping of the tube (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0695592 A1 19960207; EP 0695592 B1 20011212; AU 2339995 A 19960215; AU 689890 B2 19980409; BR 9503520 A 19960528; DE 69524496 D1 20020124; DE 69524496 T2 20020516; FR 2723329 A1 19960209; FR 2723329 B1 19960913; NO 307819 B1 20000605; NO 953028 A 19960205; NO 953028 D0 19950801; US 5619878 A 19970415

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050629

2004-02-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030629

2003-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030629

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524496 20020124

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001004

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960807

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT