Global patent index - EP 0695635 B1

EP 0695635 B1 2000-04-19 - Device for fixing packings on printing cylinders

Title (en)

Device for fixing packings on printing cylinders

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Befestigen von Aufzügen auf Druckzylindern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour attacher des habillages sur des cylindres d'impression

Publication

EP 0695635 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95110529 A

Priority

DE 4424930 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0695635A2] The top part of the gripper face (37) is spaced from the first wall (9) of the cylinder groove (1,2) by a set distance (a). This is equal to the maximum thickness (d) of the blanket or other cover involved (12), as against the spacing at the bottom (u) which is several times distance (a) so that the lower part (19) of the groove (2) wall (9) facing the surface (37) acts as a first clamping surface. This works with a clamping block (10) arranged in the space between gripper and wall (9) when the block converges on the first clamping surface. The block forms one end of the slide (6) underpinning the gripper spindle (39). The slide is designed as a comb whose several fingers (22) terminate (23) in rollers (24). The rollers contact the contact face (25) of the respective control blocks (26) which are wedge shaped equal in number to the comb fingers to form part of an axially reciprocating control slide (27).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/12; B41F 30/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/05 (2006.01); B41F 30/00 (2006.01); B41F 30/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 30/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4424930 A1 19960125; DE 4424930 C2 19960814; EP 0695635 A2 19960207; EP 0695635 A3 19970924; EP 0695635 B1 20000419; JP 2860271 B2 19990224; JP H08169101 A 19960702; US 5562036 A 19961008

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050706

2004-09-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020706

2002-07-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020706

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010719

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981209

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980319

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT