Global Patent Index - EP 0695707 B1

EP 0695707 B1 2000-11-08 - Device for guiding material in sheet form without contact

Title (en)

Device for guiding material in sheet form without contact

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum berührungsfreien Führen bogenförmigen Materials

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le guidage sans contact d'un matériau en forme de feuille

Publication

EP 0695707 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95110718 A

Priority

DE 4427448 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0695707A2] The contactless guide member is esp. for use in a printing press. The paper sheets are hauled along a track, clear of which is a guide face with air discharge jets. The jets (48) are so aimed that the flow pattern generated consists of a first component in the sheet travel direction, and second and third ones directed towards opposite side edges of the guide. The second and third components can be symmetrical, and the current of air can flow in a trumpet shape in the sheet travel direction. The air jets can be arranged in offset transverse rows.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 5/22 (2006.01); B65H 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/228 (2013.01); B65H 29/52 (2013.01); B65H 2406/111 (2013.01); B65H 2406/1132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0695707 A2 19960207; EP 0695707 A3 19970115; EP 0695707 B1 20001108; DE 4427448 A1 19960208; DE 4427448 B4 20080731; DE 4447963 B4 20051229; DE 59508834 D1 20001214; JP 3655670 B2 20050602; JP H0859016 A 19960305; US 5687964 A 19971118

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508834

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120809

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100710

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100710

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080710

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508834 20001214

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980901

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1996-05-15 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1996-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950710

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI