Global Patent Index - EP 0695710 B1

EP 0695710 B1 2001-12-12 - Adhesive means arrangement for a replacement paper web roll

Title (en)

Adhesive means arrangement for a replacement paper web roll

Title (de)

Klebemittelanordnung für eine Vorratspapierbahnrolle

Title (fr)

Arrangement de moyens adhésifs pour des bobines de remplacement en bande de papier

Publication

EP 0695710 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95110531 A

Priority

DE 4424902 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5683807A] An adhesive arrangement for a paper web supply roll acts as both a holding and a connecting adhesive during a flying roll change. A leading portion of a first layer of the paper web is provided with a plurality of apertures. A double sided adhesive strip is placed on the leading portion of the first web layer and partially or completely overlies these apertures. Those portions of the adhesive strip overlying the apertures contact the second paper web layer and act as a holding adhesive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/18; B65H 19/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/18 (2006.01); B29C 65/00 (2006.01); B65H 19/10 (2006.01); B65H 19/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/102 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4607 (2013.01); Y10S 428/906 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2848 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5683807 A 19971104; DE 4424902 A1 19960118; DE 4424902 C2 19970213; EP 0695710 A2 19960207; EP 0695710 A3 19970910; EP 0695710 B1 20011212; JP 2670433 B2 19971029; JP H0840608 A 19960213

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040706

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040706

2003-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030919

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030723

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KOENIG & BAUER A.G.

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509930 20020124

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991126

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980303

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL