EP 0695714 A1 19960207 - Paper feeding apparatus for providing a stretched paper web, starting from an unstretched condition
Title (en)
Paper feeding apparatus for providing a stretched paper web, starting from an unstretched condition
Title (de)
Papierförderapparat zum Erzeugen einer gespannten Papierbahn ausgehend von einem ungespannten Zustand
Title (fr)
Appareil d'avancement du papier pour fournir une bande de papier étirée à partir d'un état non-étiré
Publication
Application
Priority
IT FI940144 A 19940726
Abstract (en)
A paper feeding apparatus for printers and the like, in particular suited for providing a continuous stretched web (3) of paper coming from an unstretched condition such as a loop (4) formed at the end of a paper processing machine placed upstream. The apparatus (1) comprises a first (6) and a second (7) dragging means placed one after the other and both pulling the web (3). The second dragging means (7) has a dragging speed V of the paper greater than 2-15% the dragging speed of the first dragging means (6) thereby a stretch occurs in the paper passing through them. The second dragging means (7) may comprise either two counter rotating friction rollers (7a, 7b) or three friction rollers (17,18,19) forming a U path. The apparatus allows to provide the printing group with a stretched web of paper without being complex and encumbrant as the presently known stretching means are. <MATH>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41J 15/16 (2006.01); B65H 20/20 (2006.01); B65H 23/188 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B41J 15/16 (2013.01); B65H 20/20 (2013.01); B65H 23/188 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
EP 94115533 A 19941003
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 3955737 A 19760511 - TRAISE JOHN E
- [A] GB 2075074 A 19811111 - BATYREV R I
- [A] GB 2078208 A 19820106 - CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LTD
- [A] US 2835454 A 19580520 - BOWEN JR RICHARD LE B
- [A] FR 2250696 A1 19750606 - BOBST FILS SA J [CH]
- [A] GB 1154253 A 19690604 - ATELIERS DE CONST MECANIQUES S [FR]
- [A] FR 2436734 A1 19800418 - FOBELMAC [BE]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 117 (M - 1095) 20 March 1991 (1991-03-20)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 226 (M - 412) 12 September 1985 (1985-09-12)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 33 (M - 789) 25 January 1989 (1989-01-25)
- [A] W.K. BOICE: "Controlling Speed in Multidrive Systems", MACHINE DESIGN, 22 January 1970 (1970-01-22), CLEVELAND US, pages 130 - 134, XP001381652
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0695714 A1 19960207; IT 1269129 B 19970321; IT FI940144 A0 19940726; IT FI940144 A1 19960126
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 95830318 A 19950724; IT FI940144 A 19940726