Global Patent Index - EP 0695812 B1

EP 0695812 B1 2000-01-12 - Nanocrystalline alloy with insulating coating, magnetic core made thereof, and process for forming insulating coating on a nanocrystalline alloy

Title (en)

Nanocrystalline alloy with insulating coating, magnetic core made thereof, and process for forming insulating coating on a nanocrystalline alloy

Title (de)

Nanokristalline Legierung mit isolierender Beschichtung, daraus hergestellter Magnetkern und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer isolierenden Beschichtung auf der nanokristallinen Legierung

Title (fr)

Alliage nanocristallin muni d'un revêtement isolant, noyau magnétique fabriqué avec cet alliage et procédé pour former un revêtement isolant sur cet alliage nanocristallin

Publication

EP 0695812 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95111776 A

Priority

JP 18003794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0695812A1] A nanocrystalline alloy having an insulating coating on at least one of its surfaces is disclosed. The insulating coating is formed from a solution containing at least one insulating material selected from aluminium silicates, lithium silicates and magnesium oxide. By using such a solution, cracking and exfoliation of the insulating coating during the heat treatment for crystallisation of an amorphous alloy can be effectively prevented. Also, an increase in internal stress of the nanocrystalline alloy during the heat treatment can be prevented. Therefore, a nanocrystalline alloy having good insulating properties and magnetic properties suitable for a magnetic core, in particular for a high-frequency magnetic core, can be obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 45/02; H01F 1/153; H01F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/18 (2006.01); C22C 45/02 (2006.01); H01F 1/153 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/0226 (2013.01); C22C 45/02 (2013.01); H01F 1/15308 (2013.01); H01F 1/15333 (2013.01); H01F 1/15383 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0695812 A1 19960207; EP 0695812 B1 20000112; DE 69514436 D1 20000217; DE 69514436 T2 20000803; JP H0845723 A 19960216

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040726

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040726

2003-08-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030807

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030723

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030711

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514436 20000217

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1996-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960801

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB