Global Patent Index - EP 0695828 B1

EP 0695828 B1 2002-09-25 - Method for providing the drying section of an existing papermachine with a device for coating or impregnating a moving web

Title (en)

Method for providing the drying section of an existing papermachine with a device for coating or impregnating a moving web

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Nachrüsten einer Trockenpartie einer Papiermaschine mit einer Einrichtung zur Behandlung einer laufenden Bahn durch Oberflächenbeschichtung oder Imprägnieren

Title (fr)

Méthode pour équiper la section de séchage d'une machine à papier existante avec un dispositif pour le traitement d'une bande en mouvement par couchage ou imprégnation

Publication

EP 0695828 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95108358 A

Priority

DE 4420242 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4420242A1] In an equipment for the alternative treatment of a running web, preferably made of paper or board, by means of surface coating or impregnation, in the case of treating the web a first coating unit (35) for the treatment of one side of the web (40) is arranged downstream of a drying section (10, 13). A further coating unit (35') is arranged upstream of a further drying section (12) for treating the other side of the web (40). In addition, contactless driers (21) which are arranged downstream of the coating units are assigned to a drying cylinder which is designed as a deflection roll (30, 30'). The coating units (35, 35') and the contactless driers (21) can be subsequently built into already existing drying sections. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 7/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4420242 A1 19950105; AT 224976 T 20021015; CA 2151287 A1 19951211; EP 0695828 A2 19960207; EP 0695828 A3 19961218; EP 0695828 B1 20020925; FI 110136 B 20021129; FI 952822 A0 19950608; FI 952822 A 19951211; JP H08120588 A 19960514; US 6051068 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-07-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030620

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510389 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224976 T 20021015

2001-05-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PROVIDING THE DRYING SECTION OF AN EXISTING PAPERMACHINE WITH A DEVICE FOR COATING OR IMPREGNATING A MOVING WEB

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991006

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970110

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE